CO HB1200 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the point of compliance related to the treatment process involved in treating reclaimed domestic wastewater for indoor nonpotable uses within a building where the general public can access plumbing fixtures that are used to deliver the reclaimed domestic wastewater.
Title
Reclaimed Domestic Wastewater Point Of Compliance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1200 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1200, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1200, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1200 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1200, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1200, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Governor Signed | |
2019-03-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2019-03-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-07 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-03-04 | House | House Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture |