CO HB1202 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the repeal of the income tax deduction for previously taxed income or gain for C corporations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Previous Taxed Income Gain Deduction C Corporation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Postpone House Bill 20-1202 indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 20-1202 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-26SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Postpone Indefinitely
2020-03-05SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
2020-03-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-02HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-26HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor

Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback