CO HB1205 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local Land Use Planning For Mil Install
Title
Local Land Use Planning For Mil Install
Sponsors
Rep. Su Ryden [D] | Sen. Nancy Spence [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved that House Bill 10-1205 be favorably recommended to the Committee of the Whole, and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1205, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1205, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-21 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-10 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-03 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-04-13 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-08 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-18 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs | |
2010-03-15 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-12 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-08 | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/12/2010 | |
2010-03-02 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-25 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2010-01-26 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |