CO HB1205 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creation Of Tax Expenditure Evaluation Committee
Title
Creation Of Tax Expenditure Evaluation Committee
Sponsors
Rep. KC Becker [D] | Rep. Lori Saine [R] | Sen. Owen Hill [R] | Sen. Michael Johnston [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1205 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 15-1205 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1205 to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1205, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1205, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 15-1205 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1205 to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1205, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1205, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Legislative Council Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Legislative Council |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2015-04-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-06 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-11 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-02-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |