CO HB1205 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning changing the definition of 'salvage vehicle'.
Title
Motor Vehicle Total Loss Title Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Refer House Bill 17-1205 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1205, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1205, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Refer House Bill 17-1205 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1205, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1205, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Governor Signed | |
2017-04-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |
2017-03-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-20 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-17 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/20/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |