CO HB1205 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a financial relief program to provide financial assistance to an individual earning a household income of not more than five hundred percent of the federal poverty line of which the individual spends more than twenty percent on health insurance premiums for individual health insurance purchased through the Colorado health benefit exchange, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Financial Relief Defray Individual Health Plan Costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1205 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1205 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 37 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1205, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1205 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment S] (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1205 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 37 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1205, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1205 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment S] (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-02-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment + Appropriations |