CO HB1205 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning allowing reimbursement for expenses for members of the restorative justice coordinating council.
Title
Reimburse Expenses Restorative Justice Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1205 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1205 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1205 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1205 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1205 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1205 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1205 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1205 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-03-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-18 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-02-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |