CO HB1206 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the continuation of the regulation of mental health professionals, and, in connection therewith, implementing recommendations contained in the 2019 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sunset Mental Health Professionals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1206 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1206 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.021) (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1206 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1206 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment K). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment F). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 severed section A, as amended (Attachment I). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment J). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1206, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment O). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment N). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment L). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1206, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-14 Governor Signed
2020-07-02 Sent to the Governor
2020-07-02SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-07-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-12SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-06-10SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2020-06-08SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-06SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-06-05SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-06-04SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-06-02SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-05-28SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-05-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to
2020-05-27HouseHouse Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-05-26HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-03-17HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 03/30/2020 - No Amendments
2020-03-13HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-03-09HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-02-21HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance
2020-02-19HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2020-01-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1206
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1206_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1206_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1206_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1206_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1206_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1206_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ace21fdb0ce3f40b8725851500689811-hb20-1206-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ace21fdb0ce3f40b8725851500689811-hb20-1206-7-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ace21fdb0ce3f40b8725851500689811-hb20-1206-8-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ace21fdb0ce3f40b8725851500689811-hb20-1206-9-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ace21fdb0ce3f40b8725851500689811-hb20-1206-10-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ace21fdb0ce3f40b8725851500689811-hb20-1206-6-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ace21fdb0ce3f40b8725851500689811-hb20-1206-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ace21fdb0ce3f40b8725851500689811-hb20-1206-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ace21fdb0ce3f40b8725851500689811-hb20-1206-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ace21fdb0ce3f40b8725851500689811-hb20-1206-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ace21fdb0ce3f40b8725851500689811-hb20-1206-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6f9cd17014ddb7d28725852600751e19-hb20-1206-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d9abb92d6e8debc78725852a004da278-hb20-1206-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1206vote555231
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1206vote551fc4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1206vote553a5b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6eab7e13ca869963872585760060019a-hb20-1206-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bd5b6d116c6b96568725857b004bc335-hb20-1206-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1206vote5c4d6d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1206vote11d8c3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1206vote11c473

Bill Comments

feedback