CO HB1207 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a requirement that motor vehicles meet traction-control standards for winter conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Winter Conditions And Traction Control Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 46 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 19-1207, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 19-1207, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1207 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17 Governor Signed
2019-04-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-16SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-16SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-12SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-12SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-10SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-09SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-08SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-05SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-02SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
2019-03-11HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-08HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-21HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1207
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1207_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1207_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1207_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1207_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1207_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1207_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ae4f0818a83d33ad872583b40066ef70-hb19-1207-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1207vote5b06ac
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3d83670ec555d23d872583d0006e207b-hb19-1207-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3d83670ec555d23d872583d0006e207b-hb19-1207-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1207vote5c81c2
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1207vote5d5fce
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1207vote5d4ebd

Bill Comments

feedback