CO HB1208 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the expansion of the income tax credit for child care expenses that is a percentage of a similar federal income tax credit.
Title
Expand Child Care Expenses Income Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1208, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.010 [Amendment G]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1208, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1208, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1208, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1208, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1208, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1208, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.010 [Amendment G]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1208, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1208, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1208, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1208, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1208, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-09 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |
2018-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-12 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-02-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |