CO HB1211 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the continuation of the licensing of egg dealers, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations contained in the 2019 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sunset Regulation Of Egg Dealers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1211 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1211 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1211 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1211 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 20-1211 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Governor Signed
2020-06-26 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-26HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-10SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-09SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-09SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-06-08SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-06-06SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2020-06-05HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-04HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-03HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-03-12HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-02-24HouseHouse Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Unamended to Finance
2020-01-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1211
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1211_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1211_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1211_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1211_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1211_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1211_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/11a001ecdbbdb69b87258518006eb820-hb20-1211-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/94295f34535e407887258529005dccc0-hb20-1211-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/44ea509c4802d2d88725857c0063bde6-hb20-1211-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1211vote03e769
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0e765df05637b43e8725858200183442-hb20-1211-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dee0304afeccb627872585820069b380-hb20-1211-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1211vote57e870

Bill Comments

feedback