CO HB1212 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the licensing of freestanding emergency departments, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Freestanding Emergency Departments Licensure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1212 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1212, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - House - House Finance: Substitute motion to adopt amendment L.004 [Attachment D]. (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1212, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1212, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1212, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1212, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1212, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - House - House Finance: Substitute motion to adopt amendment L.004 [Attachment D]. (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1212, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1212, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1212, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1212, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-23 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/23/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-03-15 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to Finance |
2018-02-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |