CO HB1212 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the recreation of the community association manager licensing program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recreate Homeowners' Association Community Manager Licensing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 38 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1212 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1212, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.014) (Y: 23 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1212 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1212 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L002 (Attachment A) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1212, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1212, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-20 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-20 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-05-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-02SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-05-02SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-05-01SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-04-30SenateSenate Committee on Finance Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
2019-04-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2019-04-26HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-25HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-23HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-17HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to Finance
2019-02-25HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1212
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1212_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1212_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1212_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1212_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1212_rer.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0111c4cedb180a7b872583c9006fe4e3-hb19-1212-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1882891d1946fcac872583c3007e02cc-hb19-1212-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1882891d1946fcac872583c3007e02cc-hb19-1212-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1882891d1946fcac872583c3007e02cc-hb19-1212-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0111c4cedb180a7b872583c9006fe4e3-hb19-1212-6-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0111c4cedb180a7b872583c9006fe4e3-hb19-1212-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0111c4cedb180a7b872583c9006fe4e3-hb19-1212-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0111c4cedb180a7b872583c9006fe4e3-hb19-1212-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0111c4cedb180a7b872583c9006fe4e3-hb19-1212-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0111c4cedb180a7b872583c9006fe4e3-hb19-1212-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4aa5a28d83849cf6872583df007fc8c0-hb19-1212-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/33af6435b30df4c8872583e5004c4276-hb19-1212-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1212vote7392a2
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1212vote5b6f17
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9b61c59278b2d8a3872583ed00796d7a-hb19-1212-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8dfa1fb891679264872583ee005f9593-hb19-1212-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1212vote5e719b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1212vote7f28a8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1212vote7f0839

Bill Comments

feedback