CO HB1214 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a requirement that the joint budget committee recommend new methods to finance the state's ongoing capital needs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Budget Committee Requirement To Recommend Capital Financing Methods

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1214 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1214, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - Capital Development Committee: Recommend House Bill 19-1214. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Governor Signed
2019-04-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-11SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-10SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-09SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-20SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
2019-03-19HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-18HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-03-15HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-15HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1214
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1214_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1214_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1214_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1214_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1214_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1214_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6d0665f48af00c32872583be004e22a6-hb19-1214-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6d0665f48af00c32872583be004e22a6-hb19-1214-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1214vote5490a6
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5f867f9e6139903f872583b6005321ac-hb19-1214-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b5a5ac07724bfd91872583d7004b3a46-hb19-1214-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1214vote5f35b1

Bill Comments

feedback