CO HB1214 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the statutes governing home warranty service contracts, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations contained in the 2019 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset Home Warranty Service Contracts
Sponsors
Rep. Marc Snyder [D] | Rep. Dave Williams [R] | Sen. John Tate [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 20-1214 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 20-1214 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 20-1214 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 20-1214 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2020-03-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-02 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |