CO HB1216 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning measures to reduce a patient's costs of prescription insulin drugs, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reduce Insulin Prices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 53 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1216 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1216, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1216, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1216, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-20 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1216, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1216, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22 Governor Signed
2019-05-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-30SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-29SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-26SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-24SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-19SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2019-04-16HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-15HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-12HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-12HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-02-28HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1216
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1216_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1216_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1216_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1216_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1216_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1216_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5831ffede0af576a872583c3006b79b1-hb19-1216-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5831ffede0af576a872583c3006b79b1-hb19-1216-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5831ffede0af576a872583c3006b79b1-hb19-1216-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/223a476141623524872583da004c2c22-hb19-1216-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/223a476141623524872583da004c2c22-hb19-1216-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1216vote5c78be
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9ec40ff802633244872583e100657b2d-hb19-1216-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/75d097b376dfbac2872583e6004b76f8-hb19-1216-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1216vote69a7a0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1216vote0283ab
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1216vote0255d0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9ec40ff802633244872583e100657b2d-hb19-1216-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9ec40ff802633244872583e100657b2d-hb19-1216-2-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback