CO HB1216 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the state board of nursing, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations contained in the 2019 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset Continue Nurse Practice Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1216 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1216 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.005) (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1216 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1216 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1216, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1216, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1216 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1216 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.005) (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1216 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1216 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1216, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1216, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2020-03-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-03-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-03-06 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-06 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-27 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-02-11 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Finance |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |