CO HB1217 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the continuation of marijuana financial services cooperatives, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations contained in the 2019 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sunset Marijuana Financial Services Cooperatives

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1217 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1217 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27 Governor Signed
2020-03-23 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-14SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-13SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-10SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-24SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2020-02-21HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-20HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-19HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-13HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1217
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1217_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1217_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1217_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1217_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1217_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1217_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9252eda7a327a8f28725850d005d85dd-hb20-1217-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1217vote5b8313
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4655a6589cdd136087258527006e1610-hb20-1217-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1217vote550667

Bill Comments

feedback