CO HB1223 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of the rural arts grant program, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Rural Arts Grant Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1223 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Postpone House Bill 20-1223 indefinitely. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Postpone House Bill 20-1223 indefinitely. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 20-1223, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 20-1223, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1223, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 20-1223, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 20-1223, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Postpone House Bill 20-1223 indefinitely. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Postpone House Bill 20-1223 indefinitely. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 20-1223, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 20-1223, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1223, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 20-1223, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 20-1223, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2020-03-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-06 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-03-06 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-24 | House | House Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture + Appropriations |