CO HB1225 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning prohibiting the use of monetary bail for certain levels of offenses except in certain circumstances.
Title
No Monetary Bail For Certain Low-level Offenses
Sponsors
Rep. Leslie Herod [D] | Rep. Matt Soper [R] | Sen. Paul Lundeen [R] | Sen. Pete Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1225 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.005. (Y: 3 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1225, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1225, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1225 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.005. (Y: 3 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1225, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1225, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Governor Signed | |
2019-04-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-03-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-21 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |