CO HB1228 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning forensic medical evidence of sexual assault, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Protect Survivors' Rights To Rape Kit Evidence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Postpone House Bill 20-1228 indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1228, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1228, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1228, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1228, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1228, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1228, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2020-03-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-06 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-13 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |