CO HB1231 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning efficiency standards for equipment sold in Colorado, and, in connection therewith, requiring certain appliances, plumbing fixtures, and other products sold for residential or commercial use to meet energy efficiency and water efficiency standards.
Title
New Appliance Energy And Water Efficiency Standards
Sponsors
Rep. Meg Froelich [D] | Rep. Cathy Kipp [D] | Sen. Pete Lee [D] | Sen. Kevin Priola [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 19-1231, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment R). (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 19-1231, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment J). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment K). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment L). (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1231, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment M) (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1231, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 19-1231, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment R). (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 19-1231, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment J). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment K). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment L). (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1231, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment M) (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1231, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2019-04-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-03 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-01 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-03-29 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-03-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |