CO HB1232 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the alignment of compliance with the federal "Indian Child Welfare Act".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aligning Indian Child Welfare Act Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1232, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1232, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1232 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-16SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-15SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-12SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-10SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-29SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2019-03-26HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-25HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-03-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1232
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1232_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1232_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1232_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1232_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1232_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1232_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dd2983861006b4e4872583c4006b54c8-hb19-1232-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1232vote682c35
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/297f5896e65cb95b872583d8006b7d3a-hb19-1232-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1232vote5acfa0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1232vote5eca26
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1232vote5edabb
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/297f5896e65cb95b872583d8006b7d3a-hb19-1232-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback