CO HB1234 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning clarification of the laws governing simulated gambling activity.
Title
Internet Sweepstakes Café Revise Legal Terms
Sponsors
Rep. KC Becker [D] | Sen. Paul Lundeen [R] | Sen. Bob Gardner [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 8 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment I). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 18-1234, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1234, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1234, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 8 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment I). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 18-1234, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1234, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1234, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-07 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2018-03-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-23 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-03-22 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/23/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-21 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/22/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-20 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/21/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-15 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |