CO HB1234 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning peace officer status for certain employees of the department of revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peace Officer Status For Certain DOR Department of Revenue Employees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Postpone House Bill 20-1234 indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1234 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-26SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
2020-03-05SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2020-03-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-03HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-27HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-31HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback