CO HB1259 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning support for species conservation trust fund projects, and, in connection therewith, making transfers to and appropriations from the species conservation trust fund for purposes recommended by the department of natural resources.
Title
Species Conservation Trust Fund Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1259 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 19-1259 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1259 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1259 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1259 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 19-1259 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1259 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1259 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2019-04-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-09 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-09 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-01 | House | House Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-03-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture |