CO HB1263 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning adding certain conditions to the list of disabling medical conditions for medical marijuana use, and, in connection therewith, adding autism spectrum disorders.
Title
Medical Marijuana Use For Autism And Acute Pain
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 54 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.005 [Attachment L]. (Y: 2 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.007 [Attachment K]. (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.006 [Attachment M]. (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.005 [Attachment L]. (Y: 2 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.007 [Attachment K]. (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.006 [Attachment M]. (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Governor Vetoed | |
2018-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-04 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-05-01 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2018-04-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-11 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/11/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-04-05 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |