CO HB1263 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning changing the penalty for certain violations pursuant to the "Uniform Controlled Substances Act of 2013", and, in connection therewith, making and reducing an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Offense Level For Controlled Substance Possession

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.027) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.028) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.016 (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1263, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1263, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.014 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.013 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1263, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1263, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1263, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1263, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1263, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1263, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-05-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-05-02SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-05-01SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-27SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-26SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-04-22SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance
2019-04-18SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-04-18HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-17HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-16HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-08HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-04-02HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance
2019-03-22HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1263
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1263_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1263_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1263_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1263_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1263_rer.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/69ec6c66eb04b7fc872583d0006ba0dc-hb19-1263-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a93e77d8c2029914872583d600716997-hb19-1263-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/69ec6c66eb04b7fc872583d0006ba0dc-hb19-1263-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/69ec6c66eb04b7fc872583d0006ba0dc-hb19-1263-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/69ec6c66eb04b7fc872583d0006ba0dc-hb19-1263-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/69ec6c66eb04b7fc872583d0006ba0dc-hb19-1263-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/738cb6a7afb5b5f6872583de004c97b8-hb19-1263-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/738cb6a7afb5b5f6872583de004c97b8-hb19-1263-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a93e77d8c2029914872583d600716997-hb19-1263-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1263vote5965c0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a01714f8c8ccfb4c872583e4007d77a2-hb19-1263-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/130fa3d03b06abc1872583e9001e0040-hb19-1263-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1bccae604c405791872583e9007f770e-hb19-1263-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1bccae604c405791872583e9007f770e-hb19-1263-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1bccae604c405791872583e9007f770e-hb19-1263-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a01714f8c8ccfb4c872583e4007d77a2-hb19-1263-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a01714f8c8ccfb4c872583e4007d77a2-hb19-1263-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a01714f8c8ccfb4c872583e4007d77a2-hb19-1263-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1263vote5d8403
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1263vote5cf1ee
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1263vote5cd1d9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1263vote7b4935
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1263vote7a9cdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/130fa3d03b06abc1872583e9001e0040-hb19-1263-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback