CO HB1265 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the penalty for a person who passes a snowplow that is performing its service function in echelon formation with at least one other snowplow, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Right-Of-Way For Snowplows In Echelon Formation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 19-1265 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1265, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1265 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17 Governor Signed
2019-05-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-10 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-10HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-26SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-23SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-16SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
2019-04-16HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-15HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-12HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-12HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-10HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-03-22HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1265
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1265_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1265_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1265_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1265_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1265_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1265_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/944193bd4fe076c9872583d8006b3ca6-hb19-1265-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1a084f0f526d42b8872583da004d2dbb-hb19-1265-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1a084f0f526d42b8872583da004d2dbb-hb19-1265-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1265vote5bfc11
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a6222d4cff1c4f3d872583e60005e008-hb19-1265-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1265vote670ce4

Bill Comments

feedback