CO HB1279 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Income Tax Credit For Business Personal Property
Title
Income Tax Credit For Business Personal Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt conceptual amendment to remove general fund transfer (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1279, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. Conceptual Amendment that Carolyn Described to Viktor The motion passed on a vote of 5-1. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1279 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed on a vote of 10-3. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed on a vote of 11-2. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1279, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1279, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1279, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1279, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1279, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. Conceptual Amendment that Carolyn Described to Viktor The motion passed on a vote of 5-1. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1279 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed on a vote of 10-3. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed on a vote of 11-2. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1279, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1279, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1279, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1279, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-20 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-06 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-05 | House | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2014-04-14 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-11 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee on Finance Re-Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-03-06 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to Finance |
2014-02-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development + Finance + Appropriations |