CO HB1279 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creation Of Sister-state Relationship Program
Title
Creation Of Sister-state Relationship Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1279 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1279 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1279 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1279 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1279, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1279, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1279 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1279 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1279 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1279, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1279, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |