CO HB1279 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a requirement that certain practitioners prescribe controlled substances electronically.
Title
Electronic Prescribing Controlled Substances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1279 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1279 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.008 [Attachment B], as amended. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1279, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1279, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1279 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.008 [Attachment B], as amended. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1279, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1279, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-16 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/17/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-04-13 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/11/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-04-09 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/10/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-04-04 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/09/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-29 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |