CO HB1279 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Protect Public Health Firegfighter Safety Regulation PFAS Polyfluoroalkyl Substances
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Exum [D] | Rep. Lois Landgraf [R] | Sen. Pete Lee [D] | Sen. Dennis Hisey [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1279 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1279, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1279, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1279 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1279 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1279, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1279, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1279 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-02 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2019-04-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-17 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-16 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-16 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-11 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-03-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |