CO HB1287 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning methods to increase access to treatment for behavioral health disorders, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Treatment For Opioids And Substance Use Disorders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1287 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1287 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1287, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment M). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1287, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1287, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1287 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1287 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1287, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment M). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1287, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1287, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-17 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |