CO HB1289 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an alignment of certain eligibility deadlines affecting precinct caucuses under the "Uniform Election Code of 1992".
Title
Align Precinct Caucus Eligibility Deadlines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1289 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1289 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1289 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1289 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Governor Signed | |
2020-03-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2020-02-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-18 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-02-14 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-11 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |