CO HB1297 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning clarifying that personal immunization exemptions cannot be used as the sole basis for child abuse or neglect for the purposes of Colorado's children's code.
Title
Immunization Status And Child Abuse Neglect
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1297 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1297 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 22 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1297, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) as amended by L.004 (Attachment F). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1297, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1297 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1297 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 22 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1297, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) as amended by L.004 (Attachment F). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1297, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2020-06-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-05-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |