CO HB1308 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning foster care prevention services to align current standards with the federal "Family First Prevention Services Act".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foster Care Prevention Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1308 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1308, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B), as amended. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1308, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1308, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23 Governor Signed
2019-05-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-30SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-27SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-26SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
2019-04-26HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-25HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-25HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-12HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-04-03HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1308
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1308_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1308_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1308_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1308_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1308_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1308_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8212bf6bbf64bc0b872583da0069e7a1-hb19-1308-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8212bf6bbf64bc0b872583da0069e7a1-hb19-1308-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8212bf6bbf64bc0b872583da0069e7a1-hb19-1308-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8212bf6bbf64bc0b872583da0069e7a1-hb19-1308-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e9263cbd2e2c6d31872583e700522f7b-hb19-1308-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e9263cbd2e2c6d31872583e700522f7b-hb19-1308-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1308vote59b4f3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6a6a22ac1f6473f7872583e9007fe45b-hb19-1308-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1308vote5597de

Bill Comments

feedback