CO HB1316 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the protection of parties through the enforcement of proper surrogacy agreements.
Title
Gestational And Genetic Surrogacy Agreements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1316, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1316, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1316, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |