CO HB1322 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an increase in the opportunities for the public to participate in the process by which the property tax administrator prepares certain property tax materials.
Title
Public Participation Property Tax Manuals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1322 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/30/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |