CO HB1326 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning rate flexibility on existing procedures in the Colorado dental health care program for low-income seniors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rates For Senior Low-income Dental Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1326 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1326 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-14 Governor Signed
2019-05-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-30SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-29SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-04-26HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-25HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-24HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-22HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-17HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1326
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1326_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1326_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1326_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1326_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1326_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1326_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/906fd8e5fd4d3773872583e40079ab76-hb19-1326-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1326vote58ea8f
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8eda75ddaea52403872583ec0004173b-hb19-1326-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1326vote5597e9

Bill Comments

feedback