CO HB1330 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Updating Telecommunications Technology Language
Title
Updating Telecommunications Technology Language
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1330 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1330 to the Committee on State Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1330 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1330 to the Committee on State Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1330 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-09 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-07 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology + State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2014-04-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-08 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/07/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-03-25 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |