CO HB1330 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Correction Statement Sec State Erroneous Filed Doc
Title
Correction Statement Sec State Erroneous Filed Doc
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Lee [D] | Sen. Mark Scheffel [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1330 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1330 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1330 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1330 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1330 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1330 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-05-05 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-05 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2016-04-14 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-13 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-07 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |