CO HB1330 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an exemption from regulation by the division of professions and occupations in the department of regulatory agencies for persons who provide hair drying services only.
Title
Exempt Hair Drying Services From Department Of Regulatory Agencies Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1330 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1330 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1330 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2019-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-24 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |