CO HB1330 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning modifications to the "Colorado Governmental Immunity Act" to clarify the status of immunity from liability that applies to the university of Colorado hospital authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CGIA Colorado Governmental Immunity Act And A State Hospital Authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1330 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1330 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02 Governor Signed
2020-06-29 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-02SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-05-28SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-05-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2020-05-27HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-05-26HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-14HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 03/30/2020 - No Amendments
2020-03-13HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-03-10HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-02-25HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1330
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1330_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1330_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1330_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1330_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1330_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1330_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/652806b562413de0872585270072ffa5-hb20-1330-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1330vote55a17d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b8208c82beb067ab8725857600603b1b-hb20-1330-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1330vote559c65

Bill Comments

feedback