CO HB1332 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of money in the Colorado telephone users with disabilities fund to provide talking book library services for certain persons with disabilities, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Telephone Users Disabilities Fund Talking Book Library
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1332 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1332, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1332 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1332 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1332, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1332 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2019-04-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-27 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-25 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |