CO HB1347 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the child care licensure exemption for family child care homes.
Title
Licensure Exemption For Family Child Care Homes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1347 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1347 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1347 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1347 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2020-06-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-02 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-05-27 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-03-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |