CO HB1364 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the repeal of the program to increase public awareness of opioid use implemented by the center for research into substance use disorder prevention, treatment, and recovery support strategies, and, in connection therewith, repealing the requirement for appropriations to the center for the program, eliminating the scheduled sunset review of the program, and reducing an appropriation.
Title
Repeal Opioid Awareness Program And Appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1364 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1364 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1364 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1364 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2020-06-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-02 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-05-29 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 06/01/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-05-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-05-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |