CO HB1375 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the nonsubstantive revision of statutes in the Colorado Revised Statutes, as amended, and, in connection therewith, amending or repealing obsolete, imperfect, and inoperative law to preserve the legislative intent, effect, and meaning of the law.
Title
Revisor's Bill
Sponsors
Rep. Yeulin Willett [R] | Sen. Pete Lee [D] | Sen. Bob Gardner [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1375, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1375, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1375, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1375, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1375, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1375, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1375, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1375, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-04 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-05-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |