CO HB1385 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the increased money received due to the federal "Families First Coronavirus Response Act", and, in connection therewith, making and reducing appropriations.
Title
Use Of Increased Medicaid Match
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1385 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1385 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1385 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1385 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2020-06-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-02 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-05-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-05-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |