CO HB1411 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the allocation of money the state received from the federal coronavirus relief fund for behavioral health services.
Title
COVID-19 Funds Allocation For Behavioral Health
Sponsors
Sen. Dafna Michaelson Jenet [D] | Rep. Tracy Kraft-Tharp [D] | Sen. Brittany Pettersen [D] | Sen. Rhonda Fields [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1411 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1411 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1411 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1411, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1411, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1411 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1411 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1411 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1411, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1411, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2020-06-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-06-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-05 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-06-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |